This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:30:02 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. GUILLERMO A SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUILLERMO A SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GUILLERMO A SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234193 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057872.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234193 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057872.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/06/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/06/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2638067 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2018 04:00:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234193 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057872.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601137 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 03:57:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.