This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:23:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. FREDERICK ULMER

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FREDERICK ULMER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

FREDERICK ULMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/26/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/26/2014

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4210381 RECEIVED ON 06/26/2014 10:24:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462316 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:16:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less