This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:41:25

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Midland Funding Llc against Esvelda Bran in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Esvelda Bran
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Midland Funding Llc
  • Represented By
    • Kristy Gabrielova
    • David B. Snyder
    • Patrick T. Sullivan

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; ...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; ...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDIN...

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDIN...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON ...

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON ...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

Fees Apply
NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING...

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING...

Fees Apply
JUDGMENT (FILED 8/26/16) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLA...

JUDGMENT (FILED 8/26/16) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLA...

Fees Apply
EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING L...

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING L...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FU...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FU...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26...

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/31/2018
  • 01/31/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4810953 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 01:29:24 PM.
  • 08/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK
  • 08/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
  • 08/26/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 2444.29 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST BRAN, ESVELDA .
  • 08/12/2016
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016
  • 08/12/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016
  • 08/12/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016
  • 08/12/2016
  • JUDGMENT (FILED 8/26/16) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016
  • 08/12/2016
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016
  • 08/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4590778 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2016 07:19:30 PM.
  • 04/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/13/2016
  • 04/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2454976 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2016 05:01:56 PM.
  • 03/01/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928276 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752494.
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509847 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:08:56 PM.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.