This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:45:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. DONALD CLAVESILLA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DONALD CLAVESILLA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DONALD CLAVESILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 09/06/2017) RECEIVED ON 09/05/2017.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 09/06/2017) RECEIVED ON 09/05/2017.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/22/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/22/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/25/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/25/2017

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927624 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751849.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927624 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751849.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/08/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/08/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/23/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/23/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC REJECTED ON 03/23/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2606335 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2017 07:41:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 09/06/2017) RECEIVED ON 09/05/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3583920 RECEIVED ON 09/05/2017 07:43:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2464103 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2016 11:40:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927624 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751849.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509530 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:25:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.