This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:54 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. DEBORA WHITE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEBORA WHITE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DEBORA WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751687.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751687.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/15/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/15/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/29/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/29/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/28/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/28/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4724505 RECEIVED ON 05/15/2017 06:53:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1337608 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2016 01:48:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1335240 RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016 12:50:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3396104 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016 10:14:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751687.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509436 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:49:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less