This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 07:42:36 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC VS. CHRISTINA KATSIVALIS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTINA KATSIVALIS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

CHRISTINA KATSIVALIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DEANNA FRASER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

CHAD K. CASEY

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 01/23/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 01/23/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 01/04/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 01/04/2019 10:00:00 AM.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 02/13/2018

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 02/13/2018

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 08/18/2017

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 08/18/2017

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 08/02/2017

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 08/02/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185115 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12008815.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185115 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12008815.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2754706 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019 01:30:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 01/04/2019 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3635491 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2018 08:52:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4759269 RECEIVED ON 08/18/2017 11:56:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3572488 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017 08:09:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185115 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12008815.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ON 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4746581 RECEIVED ON 07/11/2017 11:29:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTY GABRIELOVA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEANNA FRASER