This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 08:27:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. CHRISTIAN MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTIAN MUNOZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CHRISTIAN MUNOZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

MISHAELA J GRAVES

DEANNA FRASER

CHAD K CASEY

PATRICK T SULLIVAN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/13/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/13/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/09/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014015.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014015.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3616808 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2017 12:07:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2581309 RECEIVED ON 08/09/2017 03:22:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12014015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2574307 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2017 12:01:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK T SULLIVAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTY GABRIELOVA