This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:51:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. BLANCA MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLANCA MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BLANCA MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/28/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/28/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/15/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/15/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/23/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/23/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927534 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751759.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927534 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751759.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/13/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/13/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3425278 RECEIVED ON 06/15/2016 04:28:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4551247 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2016 10:36:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4532880 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2016 06:17:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3396386 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016 02:58:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927534 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751759.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385170 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:30:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.