This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/05/2022 at 07:39:32 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS. NADYA M HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NADYA M HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Defendant

Nadya M Hernandez

Buena Park, CA 90621

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D. Kahn

Christina Arnold

Hyo Jin Julia Jung

Meline Grigoryan

Abril F Saglio-Ruiz

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994156 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822069.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994156 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822069.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/18/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/18/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/28/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/28/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1945320 RECEIVED ON 01/28/2022 11:32:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21111017 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2022 10:48:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994156 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822069.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31106967 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2022 02:28:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - MICHAEL D. KAHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abril F. Saglio-Ruiz