This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 07:51:03 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS. JULIUS SCHRAM

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIUS SCHRAM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Defendant

Julius Schram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abril F. Saglio-Ruiz

Christina Arnold

Hyo Jin Julia Jung

Meline Grigoryan

Michael D. Kahn

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12954956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12782846.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12954956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12782846.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHRAM, JULIUS ON 10/06/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHRAM, JULIUS ON 10/06/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/27/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/27/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/24/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/24/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944848 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772745.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944848 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772745.

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12954956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12782846.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1902748 RECEIVED ON 10/06/2021 10:38:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHRAM, JULIUS ON 10/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31066973 RECEIVED ON 09/27/2021 08:23:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21069121 RECEIVED ON 09/24/2021 07:57:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944848 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772745.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41241292 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2021 01:59:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meline Grigoryan