This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/21/2022 at 02:04:45 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS. JUANA E SANTIZO

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUANA E SANTIZO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Defendant

Juana E Santizo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D. Kahn

Meline Grigoryan

Abril F. Saglio-Ruiz

Christina Arnold

Hyo Jin Julia Jung

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13065920 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12893913.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13065920 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12893913.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/06/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/06/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/19/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/19/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11014695 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2022 01:29:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11008889 RECEIVED ON 07/06/2022 10:36:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11007642 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2022 04:32:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41349177 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2022 07:47:13 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 06/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13065920 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12893913.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - MICHAEL D. KAHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abril F. Saglio-Ruiz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meline Grigoryan