This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 06:49:27 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS. JOSEPH E MASSEY

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSEPH E MASSEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Defendant

Joseph E Massey

Dana Point, CA 92629-4005

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abril F Saglio-Ruiz

Christina Arnold

Hyo Jin Julia Jung

Jack H Pogosian

Meline Grigoryan

Michael D. Kahn

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 08/27/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 08/27/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/15/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/15/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12737669.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12737669.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1887573 RECEIVED ON 08/27/2021 11:19:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31038876 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2021 08:53:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12737669.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1867284 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2021 09:21:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - MICHAEL D. KAHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abril F. Saglio-Ruiz