Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 08:21:51 (UTC).

MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC VS. DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

MidAmerica Properties, LLC

Defendant

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

Joshua P. Friedman and Associates, Inc.

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865793 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693472.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865793 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693472.

WRIT (AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY) ISSUED ON 03/30/2021

WRIT (AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY) ISSUED ON 03/30/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 03/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 03/03/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12845409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12672968.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12845409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12672968.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/18/2021) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2021.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/18/2021) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2021

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2021

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865793 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693472.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY) ISSUED ON 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1825303 RECEIVED ON 03/20/2021 03:08:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41164773 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2021 05:07:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12845409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12672968.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3980988 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2021 08:48:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/18/2021) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDAMERICA PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. is a litigant