This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 03:43:46 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. THE J.C. & UTTERBACK GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE J C UTTERBACK GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mid-Century Insurance Company

Defendant

The J.C. & Utterback Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Hettena Law Firm

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904079.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904079.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/20/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/20/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21204889 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2022 12:31:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41361312 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2022 11:18:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41357854 RECEIVED ON 07/12/2022 03:00:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904079.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant