This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 07:45:21 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. CYPRESS S.B. CAR SPA, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYPRESS S B CAR SPA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CYPRESS S.B. CAR SPA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Hettena Law Firm

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/20/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/20/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12939419 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12767318.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12939419 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12767318.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31064149 RECEIVED ON 09/19/2021 06:40:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12939419 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12767318.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1890633 RECEIVED ON 09/04/2021 06:10:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant