This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 07:30:28 (UTC).

MICKAIEL KAMRAN VS. KUSH KINGDOM

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 MICKAIEL KAMRAN filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against KUSH KINGDOM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICKAIEL KAMRAN

Defendant

KUSH KINGDOM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CYNTHIA S POER

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 04/19/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 04/19/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12057242 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11881207.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12057242 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11881207.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 11/03/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 11/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/31/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/31/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/31/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/31/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12043090 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11867055.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12043090 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11867055.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12057242 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11881207.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/4/16) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4630635 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016 04:21:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4628816 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2016 06:05:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12043090 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11867055.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KAMRAN, MICKAIEL ON 10/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2500231 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2016 05:23:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less