This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 04:02:27 (UTC).

MICHELLE CURRY VS BRUCE CURRY

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 MICHELLE CURRY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRUCE CURRY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SARMIENTO, SALVADOR. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7746

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

SARMIENTO, SALVADOR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CURRY, MICHELLE

Respondent

CURRY, BRUCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANDOR & TOMPKINS ALC

Respondent Attorney

STEPHEN L. SNYDER, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/18/2018; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/18/2018; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 06/18/2018; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/18/2018; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 06/18/2018; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE 04/19/2018 Proof Of Service; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 04/18/2018 Rfo - Spousal Support; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/18/2018 Income & Expense Declaration; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/20/2018 Declaration re: Service of Declaration of Disclosure; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/23/2017 PRELIM; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/20/2017; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 10/20/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: CURRY, BRUCE WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/18/2017; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 10/18/2017; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/20/2017; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 09/20/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • SUMMONS 09/20/2017; Filing Party: CURRY, MICHELLE JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less