This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:30 (UTC).

MICHELE MOON VS. VICTORIA PLEW

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MICHELE MOON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VICTORIA PLEW. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MELVIN PLEW

MICHELE MOON

Defendants

VICTORIA PLEW

MELVIN PLEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL MAGUIRE & ASSOCIATES

RUSSELL & LAZARUS APC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 05/02/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 05/02/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLEW, VICTORIA; PLEW, MELVIN ON 05/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLEW, VICTORIA; PLEW, MELVIN ON 05/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE 06/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE 06/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752493.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752493.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11971259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11795420.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11971259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11795420.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLEW, MELVIN; PLEW, VICTORIA ON 05/04/2016

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLEW, MELVIN; PLEW, VICTORIA ON 05/04/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 04/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 04/19/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PLEW, MELVIN; PLEW, VICTORIA ON 05/31/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PLEW, MELVIN; PLEW, VICTORIA ON 05/31/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 05/25/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 05/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 04/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 04/19/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 05/25/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 05/25/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PLEW, MELVIN; PLEW, VICTORIA ON 05/18/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PLEW, MELVIN; PLEW, VICTORIA ON 05/18/2016

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3540743 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2017 03:39:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED ON 04/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4708810 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2017 07:08:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED ON 04/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3531736 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2017 04:57:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE 06/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 04/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MOON, MICHELE ON 04/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3404617 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2016 01:06:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752493.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOON, MICHELE; PLEW, MELVIN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385462 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:53:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.