This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 03:42:15 (UTC).

MICHELE LEANNE ALLISON VS. JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 MICHELE LEANNE ALLISON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Leanne Allison

Defendants

David McCully

JBT Aerotech Corporation

John Bean Technologies Corporation

Kenneth Rankin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mardirossian Akaragian LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Cunningham Swaim, LLP

Tyson & Mendes, LLP

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045103 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873119.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045103 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873119.

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045303 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873319.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045303 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873319.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045335 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873351.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045335 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873351.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION ON 05/05/2022

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/31/2022

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/31/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/08/2022 03:43:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/08/2022 03:43:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 04/11/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 04/11/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 04/11/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 04/11/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 03/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 03/21/2022

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21165621 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2022 04:27:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY JBT AEROTECH CORPORATION ON 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31153370 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022 03:20:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31153376 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022 03:21:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045103 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873119.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1965952 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2022 04:39:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13024335 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12852305.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 03/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 03/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 03/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 03/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST (CIVIL CODE 377.22)) FILED BY ALLISON, MICHELE LEANNE ON 03/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 03/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION is a litigant