This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 12:26:13 (UTC).

MICHAEL YOUNESSI VS. EXPRESS CAPITAL LENDING

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 MICHAEL YOUNESSI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EXPRESS CAPITAL LENDING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL YOUNESSI

Defendant

EXPRESS CAPITAL LENDING

Intervenors

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement relating to Impac Secured Assets Corp., Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2006-5

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Attorney

Kutak Rock LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 02/06/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 02/06/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2019 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2019 09:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 01/31/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 01/31/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12484431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12308130.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12484431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12308130.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT RELATING TO IMPAC SECURED ASSETS CORP., MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-5 ON 01/10/2019

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT RELATING TO IMPAC SECURED ASSETS CORP., MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-5 ON 01/10/2019

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT RELATING TO IMPAC SECURED ASSETS CORP., MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-5 ON 01/10/2019

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT RELATING TO IMPAC SECURED ASSETS CORP., MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-5 ON 01/10/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12454565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12278224.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12454565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12278224.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS RECEIVED ON 11/16/2018.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS RECEIVED ON 11/16/2018.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: DUE DILIGENCE PURSUANT TO CCP SEC 415.10-415.50) FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 11/16/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: DUE DILIGENCE PURSUANT TO CCP SEC 415.10-415.50) FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 11/16/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12421735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12245445.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12421735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12245445.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 08/30/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 08/30/2018.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2019 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/05/2019 AT 09:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3755124 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019 11:31:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/2019 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12484431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12308130.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • YOUNESSI, MICHAEL REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 09/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • YOUNESSI, MICHAEL REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 09/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 08/30/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Express Capital Lending is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant