This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 09:06:27 (UTC).

MICHAEL YOUNESSI VS. EXPRESS CAPITAL LENDING

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 MICHAEL YOUNESSI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EXPRESS CAPITAL LENDING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL YOUNESSI

Defendant

EXPRESS CAPITAL LENDING

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 08/17/2018.

COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 08/17/2018.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/27/2018

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/27/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 07/25/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 07/25/2018.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 08/17/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • YOUNESSI, MICHAEL REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 07/27/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 07/25/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY YOUNESSI, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Express Capital Lending is a litigant