This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:21:57 (UTC).

MICHAEL MANNING VS NATHALIE MORRIS MANNING

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MICHAEL MANNING filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NATHALIE MORRIS MANNING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1685

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MANNING, MUCHAEL JOHN

MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

Respondent

MORRIS MANNING, NATHALIE BAILEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2016
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - RESTORATION FORMER NAME 10/06/2016; Filing Party: MORRIS MANNING, NATHALIE BAILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/11/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 07/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/09/2016; Filing Party: MORRIS MANNING, NATHALIE BAILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/09/2016; Filing Party: MORRIS MANNING, NATHALIE BAILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 04/12/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/12/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/01/2016; Filing Party: MORRIS MANNING, NATHALIE BAILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/21/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MORRIS MANNING, NATHALIE BAILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MANNING, MICHAEL JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.