This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2017 at 02:47:54 (UTC).

MICHAEL KAIN VS. AGCO CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/20/2012 MICHAEL KAIN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AGCO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL KAIN

DEBRA KAIN

Defendants

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

KELSEY HAYES COMPANY

PHARMACIA CORPORATION

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

AGCO CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTER

CNH AMERICA, LLC

INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

CNH AMERICA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTER

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

GRINNELL, LLC

MOMENTIVE SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC.

DEERE & COMPANY

MOMENTIVE SPECIALITY CHEMICALS, INC. A

BASF CORPORATION

GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY

HEXION SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC.

AGCO CORPORATION

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARST & VON OISTE, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

Other Attorneys

BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION REJECTED ON 08/31/2012.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION REJECTED ON 08/31/2012.

NOTICE - OTHER (RECEIPT FOR RECORDS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/28/2012

NOTICE - OTHER (RECEIPT FOR RECORDS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/28/2012

NOTICE OF TRANSFER

NOTICE OF TRANSFER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY ON 08/24/2012

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY ON 08/24/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2012-08-24 10:02:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2012-08-24 10:02:00.0.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11211732 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11035624.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11211732 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11035624.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEERE & COMPANY ON 08/23/2012

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEERE & COMPANY ON 08/23/2012

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEERE & COMPANY ON 08/23/2012

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEERE & COMPANY ON 08/23/2012

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2012 11:28:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/14/2012 11:28:00 AM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY YARWAY CORPORATION ON 08/13/2012

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY YARWAY CORPORATION ON 08/13/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11203738 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11027630.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11203738 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11027630.

ORDER - OTHER (FROM LA COUNTY) RECEIVED ON 08/10/2012.

ORDER - OTHER (FROM LA COUNTY) RECEIVED ON 08/10/2012.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/06/2012 08:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/06/2012 08:00:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 07/20/2012.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 07/20/2012.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11188596 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11012488.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11188596 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11012488.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAIN, MICHAEL; KAIN, DEBRA ON 07/20/2012

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAIN, MICHAEL; KAIN, DEBRA ON 07/20/2012

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION REJECTED ON 08/31/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (RECEIPT FOR RECORDS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/28/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT ALAMEDA PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11212725 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11036617.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY ON 08/24/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 119765 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2012 03:02:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2012-08-24 10:02:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 08/14/12 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11211732 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11035624.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/06/2012 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CXC 104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2012 AT 10:00:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 07/20/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11188596 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11012488.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KAIN, MICHAEL; KAIN, DEBRA ON 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAIN, MICHAEL; KAIN, DEBRA ON 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KAIN, MICHAEL; KAIN, DEBRA ON 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 117017 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2012 10:15:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CNH INDUSTRIAL AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant