This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:50 (UTC).

MICHAEL GRESHAM VS LISA GRESHAM

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MICHAEL GRESHAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LISA GRESHAM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SYKES, DAPHNE G.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1704

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

SYKES, DAPHNE G.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRESHAM, MICHAEL J

Respondent

GRESHAM, LISA S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/31/2018; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 12/31/2018; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 12/31/2018; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 12/31/2018; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/31/2018; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 05/09/2017; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/09/2017; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/30/2016 5C FW SENT TO L71; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/25/2016; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/17/2016; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 03/17/2016; Filing Party: GRESHAM, LISA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRESHAM, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRESHAM, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GRESHAM, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRESHAM, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • RFO - MODIFICATION 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRESHAM, MICHAEL J

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.