This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 12:40:36 (UTC).

MICHAEL FRYE VS. AARON WILLIAM LEPHART

Case Summary

On 07/14/2016 MICHAEL FRYE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AARON WILLIAM LEPHART. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL FRYE

Defendants

AARON WILLIAM LEPHART

CITIBANK N.A.

VALORIE DODDS LEPHART

LARRY GENE LEPHART

CITIGROUP INVESTMENTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW FIRM OF RIVERS J. MORRELL III

Defendant Attorneys

FLYER & FLYER, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/12/2017 08:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/12/2017 08:59:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LEPHART, LARRY GENE; LEPHART, VALORIE DODDS ON 03/30/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LEPHART, LARRY GENE; LEPHART, VALORIE DODDS ON 03/30/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 03/22/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 03/22/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 03/03/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 03/03/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12109523 AND RE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12109523 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11933391.

STIPULATION - OTHER (RE: VALIDITY AND PRIORITY OF PROMISSORY NOTE) FILED BY CITIBANK N.A. ON 02/14/2017

STIPULATION - OTHER (RE: VALIDITY AND PRIORITY OF PROMISSORY NOTE) FILED BY CITIBANK N.A. ON 02/14/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12105184 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11929092.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12105184 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11929092.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY CITIBANK N.A. ON 02/02/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY CITIBANK N.A. ON 02/02/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 02/07/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 02/07/2017

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CITIBANK N.A. ON 02/02/2017

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CITIBANK N.A. ON 02/02/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/02/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/02/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/30/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/30/2016 08:45:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12069830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11893775.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12069830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11893775.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 11/30/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 11/30/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 11/30/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 11/30/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 11/15/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 11/15/2016

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 07/25/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1403800 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2017 10:20:42 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/12/2017 08:59:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C16.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LEPHART, LARRY GENE; LEPHART, VALORIE DODDS ON 03/30/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3528507 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2017 02:14:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1339829 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2016 12:54:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 08/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4596718 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2016 12:44:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 07/14/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11998734 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11822817.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 07/14/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 07/14/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FRYE, MICHAEL ON 07/14/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3435154 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2016 01:23:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIGROUP INVESTMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant