Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/15/2019 at 06:51:51 (UTC).

MICHAEL ANAYA VS. PAUL GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 MICHAEL ANAYA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PAUL GARCIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Anaya

Defendants

Lowry's Inc.

Beacon Roofing Supply, Inc.

United Site Services of California, Inc.

Paul Garcia

Mark Beamish Waterproofing, Inc.

Mission Valley Sanitation, Inc.

United Site Services, Inc.

Bernards Builders, Inc.

Beacon Roofing Supply

United Site Services

Lowry's Specialty Distribution

UDR, Inc.

United Site National Services Company

Kenyon Plastering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morey & Upton, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 10/03/2019

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 10/03/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/08/2019 11:07:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/08/2019 11:07:00 AM.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON DEREK W. HUNT) FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/03/2019

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON DEREK W. HUNT) FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/03/2019

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 10/02/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 10/02/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12632611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12457130.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12632611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12457130.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1673241 RECEIVED ON 10/03/2019 04:02:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/08/2019 11:07:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RONALD L. BAUER FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE DEREK W. HUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO RONALD BAUER EFFECTIVE 10/08/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON DEREK W. HUNT) FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 41019603 RECEIVED ON 10/03/2019 03:30:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 10/02/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12632611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12457130.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ANAYA, MICHAEL ON 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 41019074 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2019 03:25:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MISSION VALLEY SANITATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOWRY'S, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED SITE NATIONAL SERVICES COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BEACON ROOFING SUPPLY INC. is a litigant