This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 07:54:09 (UTC).

MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC VS. CHURNED CREAMERY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHURNED CREAMERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MFV Expositions, LLC

Defendant

Churned Creamery International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba Guerrini Law Corporation

Defendant Attorney

The Sands Law Group, APLC

Other Attorneys

RODOLFO GABA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768436 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12594952.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768436 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12594952.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CHURNED CREAMERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 10/05/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CHURNED CREAMERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 10/05/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12790334 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12617273.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12790334 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12617273.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 11/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 11/02/2020

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/24/2020.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/24/2020.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 11/24/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 11/24/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12812924 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12640003.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12812924 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12640003.

STIPULATION - OTHER (OF ALL PARTIES TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6) FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 12/01/2020

STIPULATION - OTHER (OF ALL PARTIES TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6) FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 12/01/2020

ORDER - OTHER (DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6) FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 12/01/2020

ORDER - OTHER (DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6) FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 12/01/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 06/22/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 06/22/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/23/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/23/2021

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21056519 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021 12:51:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 06/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21033370 RECEIVED ON 06/22/2021 07:41:09 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6) FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 12/01/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER (OF ALL PARTIES TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6) FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 12/01/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12812924 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12640003.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 11/02/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1782722 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2020 07:07:34 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12790334 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12617273.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41120641 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2020 04:11:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CHURNED CREAMERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 10/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768436 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12594952.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3928317 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2020 12:55:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY MFV EXPOSITIONS, LLC ON 08/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Churned Creamery International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO