This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:14 (UTC).

MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION VS. JUDITH BROWN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUDITH BROWN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTE

Defendant

JUDITH BROWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 05/29/2014; Filing Party: MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 05/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11569951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11393847.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 02/18/2014; Filing Party: MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 02/18/2014 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 02/11/2014; Filing Party: MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 02/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION REJECTED ON 02/07/2014.; Filing Party: SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION REJECTED ON 02/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH ON 12/17/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/11/2013; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/11/2013; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 36.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11452643 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11276535.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 09/10/2013; Filing Party: MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 09/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 09/10/2013; Filing Party: MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 09/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430384 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254256.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348095 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 09:46:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: MESA UPHOLSTERY DESIGN CENTER AND MIKE'S CARPETS, A CORPORATION ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less