This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 21:31:09 (UTC).

MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. VS. 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merchants Financial Guardian, Inc.

Defendant

2210 Santa Ana OPCO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Leigh E. Charness

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 03/24/2022

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 03/24/2022

WRIT (ORANGE) ISSUED ON 03/24/2022

WRIT (ORANGE) ISSUED ON 03/24/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13031012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12859026.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13031012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12859026.

JUDGMENT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/16/2021

JUDGMENT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/16/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (INTEREST) FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/14/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (INTEREST) FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/14/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585(A)) FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/14/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585(A)) FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/14/2021

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/14/2021.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/14/2021.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/14/2021

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/14/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41238704 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41238704 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21062008 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21062008 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/26/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/26/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/26/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/26/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/26/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/26/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21005570 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21005570 REJECTED.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/12/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/12/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41140254 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41140254 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41127460 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41127460 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/08/2020

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/08/2020

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41313890 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2022 01:49:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13031012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12859026.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 03/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ORANGE) ISSUED ON 03/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21065010 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2021 04:23:13 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/14/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 04/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41127460 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41140254 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41112483 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2020 01:13:58 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 09/08/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2927201 RECEIVED ON 07/30/2020 07:43:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12763717 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12590156.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 07/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 07/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MERCHANTS FINANCIAL GUARDIAN, INC. ON 07/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less