This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 03:43:06 (UTC).

MERCEDES BRITO VS. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 MERCEDES BRITO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercedes Brito

Defendant

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quill & Arrow, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13108130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12936143.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13108130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12936143.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/26/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: DOURBETAS; Department: C14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11043090 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2022 09:56:15 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13108130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12936143.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11039376 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2022 03:40:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DOURBETAS, NICO ON 09/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BRITO, MERCEDES ON 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant