This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:38 (UTC).

MEPCO SERVICES, INC. VS. CARNO & CARLTON, LLP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MEPCO SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARNO CARLTON, LLP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELIE ABINADER

MEPCO SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

ANNA M. CARNO

CARNO & CARLTON, LLP

ANDREW CARLTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BILAL LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorneys

GHASSEMIAN LAW GROUP, APC

SCHWERDTFEGER LAW GROUP

KLINEDINST PC

ROBIE & MATTHAI, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER (EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND) FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 12/01/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND) FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 12/01/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3418779 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3418779 REJECTED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICES OF KAMAL ANONINE BILAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11960439 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11784584.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICES OF KAMAL ANONINE BILAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11960439 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11784584.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 10/11/2016

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 10/11/2016

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 10/27/2016

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 10/27/2016

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 09/01/2016

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 05/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 05/27/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12111952 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11935795.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12111952 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11935795.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11976776 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11800905.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11976776 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11800905.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CARLTON, ANDREW ON 05/27/2016

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CARLTON, ANDREW ON 05/27/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12006740 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11830840.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12006740 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11830840.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 09/09/2016

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 09/09/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (DENIED) FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 01/12/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (DENIED) FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 01/12/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (SUBSITUTING INTERIM TRUSTEE) FILED BY MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 02/22/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (SUBSITUTING INTERIM TRUSTEE) FILED BY MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 02/22/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY ABINADER, ELIE; MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 04/15/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY ABINADER, ELIE; MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 05/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CARNO & CARLTON, LLP ON 05/27/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABINADER, ELIE; MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 05/20/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABINADER, ELIE; MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 05/20/2016

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1427013 RECEIVED ON 10/04/2017 08:56:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/28/2017 02:09:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ABINADER, ELIE; MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 04/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ABINADER, ELIE; MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 04/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4533123 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2016 11:47:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ABINADER, ELIE; MEPCO SERVICES, INC. ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4528309 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2016 09:22:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MEPCO SERVICES, INC.; ABINADER, ELIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509701 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:02:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.