This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 06:43:24 (UTC).

MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES VS. BENEFIT ADMINISTRATIVE SYSTEMS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BENEFIT ADMINISTRATIVE SYSTEMS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Long Beach Memorial Medical Center

Memorial Health Services

Miller Children's Hospital

Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center

Defendants

Benefit Administrative Systems, LLC

Burke Williams, Inc.

Oceanside Auto Country, Inc.

The Pape Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Stephenson, Acquisto & Colman, Inc.

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF STEPHENSON, ACQUISTO &

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/03/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/03/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12978721 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806640.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12978721 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806640.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21100904 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2021 01:55:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21097297 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 03:47:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12978721 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12806640.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21096060 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2021 03:06:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 12/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES; LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER; MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL; ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Pape Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLER CHILREN'S HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where BURKE WILLIAMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MEMORIAL HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant