Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:08:35 (UTC).

MELVIN STRONG VS. LATINO HEALTH SERVICES MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 MELVIN STRONG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LATINO HEALTH SERVICES MEDICAL GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melvin Strong

Defendants and Others

Latino Health Services Medical Group, Inc.

North Main, LLC

LATINO HEALTH SERVICES MEDICAL GROUP,

Cross Defendant

Amtech Elevator Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Gene J. Goldsman

Defendant and Other Attorneys

Long & Delis

Diederich & Associates

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12589617 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12413656.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12589617 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12413656.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LATINO HEALTH SERVICES MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 07/03/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LATINO HEALTH SERVICES MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 07/03/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12580501 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12404521.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12580501 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12404521.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2019 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2019 08:45:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 05/30/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 05/30/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 05/28/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 05/28/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 05/21/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 05/21/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 04/08/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 04/08/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2019 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2019 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 03/28/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 03/28/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12525281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12349041.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12525281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12349041.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12589617 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12413656.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LATINO HEALTH SERVICES MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3809394 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2019 06:17:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2811288 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2019 04:06:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12580501 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12404521.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH MAIN, LLC ON 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2811281 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2019 04:01:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2019 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4971925 RECEIVED ON 05/21/2019 03:51:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3778497 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2019 01:24:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2019 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 03/28/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12525281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12349041.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STRONG, MELVIN ON 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2778046 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2019 10:00:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES is a litigant