Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 07:45:54 (UTC).

MELISSA WURST VS FRITHAOF WURST

Case Summary

On 05/01/2017 MELISSA WURST filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRITHAOF WURST. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COOPER, SCOTT B.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3590

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

COOPER, SCOTT B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WURST, MELISSA ANN

Respondent

WURST, FRITHAOF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CORY ANTHONY AGUIRRE

Respondent Attorney

VON ESCH LAW GROUP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • EXHIBIT LIST - PARTY 02/19/2019; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 02/19/2019; Filing Party: WURST, FRITHAOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • CONFERENCE - VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • STIPULATION - PARTICIPATE - CHAMBERS CONFERENCE 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • EXHIBIT LIST - PARTY 01/24/2019 Amended Respondent's Exhibit List; Filing Party: WURST, FRITHAOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/24/2019 Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Filing Party: WURST, FRITHAOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 01/23/2019; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/25/2017; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 08/25/2017 W/LEAVE OF COURT Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/25/2017; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/02/2017; Filing Party: WURST, FRITHAOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/02/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: WURST, FRITHAOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 05/01/2017; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 05/01/2017; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/01/2017; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • SUMMONS 05/01/2017; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/01/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: WURST, MELISSA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less