This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:20:24 (UTC).

MELINDA KLEIN VS GARY KLEIN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MELINDA KLEIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARY KLEIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MILLER, FRANZ E. and MINERICH, PAUL T.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8288

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judges

MILLER, FRANZ E.

MINERICH, PAUL T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KLEIN, MELINDA K

Respondent

KLEIN, GARY P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LEMKIN, BARNES & ROW, INC

LEMKIN, BARNES & ROW, INC.

Respondent Attorney

MACKSOUD & MACKSOUD, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • CONFERENCE - TRIAL SETTING (AUTO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • CONFERENCE - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • NOTICE - JUDICIAL REASSIGNMENT 02/01/2019 L71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 01/30/2019 for Continuance; Filing Party: KLEIN, GARY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CONFERENCE - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CONFERENCE - TRIAL SETTING (AUTO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • CONFERENCE - TRIAL SETTING (AUTO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE - TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/15/2017; Filing Party: KLEIN, GARY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 11/15/2017; Filing Party: KLEIN, GARY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 11/07/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: KLEIN, GARY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/03/2017; Filing Party: KLEIN, MELINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/01/2017; Filing Party: KLEIN, MELINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 11/01/2017 PROPERTY CONTROL Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: KLEIN, MELINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 10/18/2017; Filing Party: KLEIN, MELINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: KLEIN, MELINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: KLEIN, MELINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: KLEIN, MELINDA K

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.