This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 06:51:26 (UTC).

MELANIE QUIRINO VS. VPM MANAGEMENT INC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 MELANIE QUIRINO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VPM MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

PERLA CORTES

Melanie Quirino

Defendants and Others

KDF North Hills LP

VPM Management Inc

KDF Communities LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Lopez Law Firm, APC

Defendant and Other Attorneys

De Simone & Huxster

James T Shott & Associates

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2022 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 01/06/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 01/06/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/29/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/29/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12987877 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12815816.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12987877 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12815816.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP; VPM MANAGEMENT INC; KDF COMMUNITIES LLC ON 12/27/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP; VPM MANAGEMENT INC; KDF COMMUNITIES LLC ON 12/27/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KDF COMMUNITIES LLC ON 12/27/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KDF COMMUNITIES LLC ON 12/27/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KDF COMMUNITIES LLC; KDF NORTH HILLS LP; VPM MANAGEMENT INC ON 12/22/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KDF COMMUNITIES LLC; KDF NORTH HILLS LP; VPM MANAGEMENT INC ON 12/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/15/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/15/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31097734 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31097734 REJECTED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/13/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/13/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982749 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810670.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982749 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810670.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/13/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/13/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12980587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12808522.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12980587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12808522.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VPM MANAGEMENT INC ON 12/09/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VPM MANAGEMENT INC ON 12/09/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VPM MANAGEMENT INC ON 12/09/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VPM MANAGEMENT INC ON 12/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE; CORTES, PERLA ON 10/29/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE; CORTES, PERLA ON 10/29/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE; CORTES, PERLA ON 10/29/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE; CORTES, PERLA ON 10/29/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/28/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/28/2021 01:30:00 PM.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/15/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/15/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 01/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41282889 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2022 06:02:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KDF NORTH HILLS LP ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41279951 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2021 09:28:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12987877 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12815816.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21103771 RECEIVED ON 12/27/2021 11:11:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31000497 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2021 04:57:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketQUIRINO, MELANIE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 04/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCORTES, PERLA APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM CR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 04/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY QUIRINO, MELANIE; CORTES, PERLA ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KDF COMMUNITIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VPM MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant