This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 14:48:45 (UTC).

MEJIA - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MEJIA - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

Respondent

ROBERT MEJIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Respondent Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: MENTAL HEALTH HEARING; Department: C09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 12/14/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/11/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1918191 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (AGREEMENT FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT) FILED BY COUNTY COUNSEL ON 11/30/2021; Filing Party: COUNTY COUNSEL ON 11/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/14/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 11/23/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPLAN FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/18/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31075302 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2021 11:39:36 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/18/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21075885 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2021 11:51:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/12/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (APPTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER) FILED BY MEJIA, ROBERT ON 10/12/2021; Filing Party: MEJIA, ROBERT ON 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41250967 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2021 08:09:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/12/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/12/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less