This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:51:29 (UTC).

MEHRDAD MOHEB VS. KEVIN QUOC TRAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MEHRDAD MOHEB filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against KEVIN QUOC TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MEHRDAD MOHEB

NAHID NASR

KHANH HOANG VIET LE

Defendants and Others

KEVIN QUOC TRAN

KEL WOODCREST INVESTMENT, LLC

TOM TRAN

TAT INVESTMENT, LLC

RUSSO & DUCKWORTH LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RUSSO & DUCKWORTH LLP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

HAMILTON LAW OFFICES

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH A. REED

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC ON 08/05/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC ON 08/05/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1405317 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1405317 REJECTED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/26/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/27/2017.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/27/2017.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC; TRAN, TOM ON 02/10/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC; TRAN, TOM ON 02/10/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC; TRAN, TOM ON 08/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC; TRAN, TOM ON 08/25/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 03/16/2016

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 03/07/2016

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 03/07/2016

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, TOM ON 04/05/2016

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, TOM ON 04/05/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/01/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/01/2017 01:30:00 PM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES

NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/05/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/05/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC ON 10/26/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY TRAN, KEVIN QUOC ON 10/26/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4651118 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4651118 REJECTED.

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1406018 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2017 09:25:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1405317 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1402948 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2017 09:57:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 08/04/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. NO CONTINUANCE FEE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2449085 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2016 08:39:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3388344 RECEIVED ON 03/07/2016 12:35:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927276 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751501.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOHEB, MEHRDAD; NASR, NAHID ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306927 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:50:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less