This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 01:32:59 (UTC).

MEHDI ALEM VS. ROBERT OWENS

Case Summary

On 02/18/2011 MEHDI ALEM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT OWENS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHDI ALEM AND SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH 2002 TRUST DATED JUNE 18, 2002

MEHDI ALEM

SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH

Cross Defendants, Others and Defendants

HAMMOND ELECTRIC INC

HALTON CORPORATION

ROBERT OWENS

KATHLEEN OWENS

MAGNESITE SPECIALITIES INC.

EDESSA CORPORATION

LOU TOBAR MARBLE

PRC CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC.

NADDOUR'S ORNAMENTAL IRON

ELADIO QUINTERO

LUIS TOBAR

DCM PLUMBING CONTRACTORS INC.

SIERRA PACIFIC INDUSTRIES

GUTTERMASTERS, INC.

FIRST CLASS GLASS, INC

A.G. PLASTERING & DRYWALL INC.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

CRAIG P. KENNEDY & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D WEISS

Cross Defendant, Other and Defendant Attorneys

COCHRAN, DAVIS & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

HART, KING & CODREN

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER P. RUIZ

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

AUSTIN, BROWNWOOD, CANNON & SANTA CRUZ

LAW OFFICES OF DARRELL C. HARRIMAN

SKANE WILCOX LLP

BRADFORD CALVIN

WENTWORTH PAOLI & PURDY LLP

DUN & MARTINEK LLP

HAFFNER HAFFNER & KIRWIN LLP

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LLP

Other Attorneys

MCNEAL TROPP BRAUN & KENNEDY LLP

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

MCNEIL TROPP BRAUN & KENNEDY LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 02/10/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 02/10/2017 09:00:00 AM.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/21/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/21/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12075453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11899417.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12075453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11899417.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/08/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/08/2016

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/08/2016

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE (FOR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE) FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE (FOR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE) FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/22/2016

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/21/2016

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/21/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM), 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12060568 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11884533.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM), 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12060568 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11884533.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/08/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/08/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/08/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 11/08/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12059392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11883357.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12059392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11883357.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 11/08/2016) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 11/08/2016) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2016.

REMITTITUR (G051441) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/31/2016

REMITTITUR (G051441) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/31/2016

ORDER G053839

ORDER G053839

OPINION G051441

OPINION G051441

AMENDED JUDGMENT (SECOND) FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 03/14/2016

AMENDED JUDGMENT (SECOND) FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 03/14/2016

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G051441

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G051441

419 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 02/10/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4652234 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2016 10:59:54 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES SCHEDULED FOR 02/10/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12075453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11899417.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4646300 RECEIVED ON 12/08/2016 09:57:28 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/08/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY OWENS, KATHLEEN; OWENS, ROBERT ON 12/08/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4638978 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2016 09:45:48 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
710 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HALTON CORPORATION ON 04/01/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (HAMMOND ELECTRIC, INC.) FILED BY ALEM, MEHDI ON 03/16/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALEM, MEHDI ON 03/16/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ALEM, MEHDI ON 03/16/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ALEM, MEHDI ON 03/16/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10839284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10663176.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/18/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALEM, MEHDI; SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHDI ALEM AND SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH 2002 TRUST DATED JUNE 18, 2002 ON 02/18/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALEM, MEHDI; SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHDI ALEM AND SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH 2002 TRUST DATED JUNE 18, 2002 ON 02/18/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALEM, MEHDI; SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHDI ALEM AND SIMI MORSHEDIZADEH 2002 TRUST DATED JUNE 18, 2002 ON 02/18/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less