This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:21:34 (UTC).

MEGAN GER VS. COMMUNITY RADIO NETWORK INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MEGAN GER filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against COMMUNITY RADIO NETWORK INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEGAN GER

Defendants

COMMUNITY RADIO NETWORK INC., A DELAWA

COMMUNITY RADIO NETWORK INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Assignee

LABOR COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

JAMES E BERRY

 

Court Documents

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LABOR COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 07/14/2014

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LABOR COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 07/14/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GER, MEGAN ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GER, MEGAN ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY GER, MEGAN ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY GER, MEGAN ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LABOR COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 07/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1178400 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2014 04:02:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FOR GER, MEGAN IN THE AMOUNT OF 4045.43 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST COMMUNITY RADIO NETWORK INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GER, MEGAN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY GER, MEGAN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105538 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 02:13:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less