This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 03:52:58 (UTC).

MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. VS. PORTS ALLIANCE TRANSPORT INC.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY USA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PORTS ALLIANCE TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.

Defendant

Ports Alliance Transport Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba Law

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13053637 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12881653.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13053637 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12881653.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 06/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 06/02/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 07/28/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 07/28/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11018581 RECEIVED ON 07/28/2022 09:33:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 07/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31164240 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2022 03:27:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 06/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1992254 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2022 10:50:47 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13053637 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12881653.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. ON 05/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY USA INC. is a litigant