This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 03:43:41 (UTC).

MAX W BROWN VS. MARK V. DZIUK

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 MAX W BROWN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MARK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Max W Brown

Defendants

Mark V. Dziuk

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

The Golden 1 Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

LS Carlson Law, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13132471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12960542.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13132471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12960542.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/21/2022

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/21/2022

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. JAMES CRANDALL) FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/21/2022

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. JAMES CRANDALL) FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/16/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/16/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 12/20/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 12/20/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156639 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984736.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156639 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984736.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 01/10/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 01/10/2023

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 01/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31254282 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2023 11:15:27 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156639 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984736.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41424460 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2022 04:41:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31244267 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2022 03:40:26 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. JAMES CRANDALL) FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21238214 RECEIVED ON 11/21/2022 02:24:09 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13132471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12960542.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41405562 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022 03:20:27 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 11/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BROWN, MAX W ON 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant