This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:47 (UTC).

MATTHEW SIPES VS. PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MATTHEW SIPES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MATTHEW SIPES

Defendants and Others

PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC.

PAYNE & FEARS LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RICHARD J. KOSSLER

Defendant and Other Attorney

ROSENBERG, SHPALL & ZEIGEN, A PROFESSIONAL LEGAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 05/23/2016

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 05/23/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 08/30/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 08/30/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/22/2016 10:28:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/22/2016 10:28:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4699575 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4699575 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY PAYNE & FEARS LLP ON 03/16/2016

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY PAYNE & FEARS LLP ON 03/16/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/26/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/26/2016 08:45:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11948797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11772950.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11948797 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11772950.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1376932 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1376932 REJECTED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 02/29/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 02/29/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/07/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/07/2016 08:45:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751473.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751473.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/07/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/07/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC. ON 08/25/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC. ON 08/25/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 07/14/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 07/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC. ON 04/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC. ON 04/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC. ON 04/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PROFESSIONAL REPROGRAPHICS SERVICES, INC. ON 04/08/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1376932 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 04/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3528866 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2017 12:46:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4699575 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/22/2016 10:28:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 04/17/2017 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY PAYNE & FEARS LLP ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3391751 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2016 11:38:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/07/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385542 RECEIVED ON 02/29/2016 08:50:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751473.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SIPES, MATTHEW ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306913 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:08:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.