This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/30/2022 at 03:46:28 (UTC).

MARY RAMIREZ VS. THE GROVE CARE AND WELLNESS

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 MARY RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE GROVE CARE AND WELLNESS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Ramirez

Stephanie Gibby

Defendants

Ensign Services, Inc.

Flagstone Healthcare Central, LLC

The Ensign Group, Inc.

The Grove Care and Wellness

Empirecare Health Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moran Law

Defendant Attorney

Fraser Watson & Croutch, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FLAGSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTRAL, LLC; THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; EMPIRECARE HEALTH ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 04/26/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FLAGSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTRAL, LLC; THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; EMPIRECARE HEALTH ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 04/26/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13040385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12868406

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13040385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12868406.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FLAGSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTRAL, LLC; THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; EMPIRECARE HEALTH ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 04/26/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FLAGSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTRAL, LLC; THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; EMPIRECARE HEALTH ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 04/26/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21151634 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2022 12:28:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FLAGSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTRAL, LLC; THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; EMPIRECARE HEALTH ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 04/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13040385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12868406.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41327064 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2022 12:28:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FLAGSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTRAL, LLC; THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; EMPIRECARE HEALTH ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 04/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21143440 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2022 11:59:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1972626 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2022 11:59:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY ON 04/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31132754 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2022 10:31:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (OF STEPHANIE GIBBY TO COMMENCE LEGAL ACTION ON BEHALF OF THE DECENDENT, MARY RAMIREZ, PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32) FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RAMIREZ, MARY; GIBBY, STEPHANIE ON 03/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13022262 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12850247.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 03/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GROVE CARE AND WELLNESS is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPIRECARE HEALTH ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIGNUM HEALTHCARE CENTRAL LLC A FOREIGN ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN SERVICES INC is a litigant