This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 06:30:48 (UTC).

MARY ANNE KESHEN VS. BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM, P.C.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 MARY ANNE KESHEN filed an Other lawsuit against BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM, P C. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Anne Keshen

Defendant

Buffington Law Firm, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/03/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/03/2019.

COMPLAINT FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FAHEY, MATHEW FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12563451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12387370.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FAHEY, MATHEW FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12563451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12387370.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/04/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/04/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/25/2019 10:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/25/2019 10:59:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/25/2019 10:59:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 10/21/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FAHEY, MATHEW FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12563451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12387370.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/03/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM, PC, A BUSINESS OF is a litigant