This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 06:45:22 (UTC).

MARTHA MACIAS VS. RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 MARTHA MACIAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martha Macias

Defendants

Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC

U.S. Bank Trust National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CDLG, PC

Defendant Attorney

Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12968212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12796135.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12968212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12796135.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/17/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12985077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12812998.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12985077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12812998.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 04/18/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12985077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12812998.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41276452 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2021 04:27:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21101065 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2021 04:27:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC; U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41265318 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2021 06:04:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1919034 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2021 06:04:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12968212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12796135.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MACIAS, MARTHA ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1915561 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2021 12:23:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant