This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:52 (UTC).

MARTHA ALVARADO VS. BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MARTHA ALVARADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTHA ALVARADO

Defendant and Respondent

BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CARSON C. NEWTON

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WFBM, LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 06/23/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 06/23/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION ON 09/01/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION ON 09/01/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12115858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11939679.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12115858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11939679.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION ON 09/15/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION ON 09/15/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF COURT TO DEDUCT COURT FILING FEES) FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF COURT TO DEDUCT COURT FILING FEES) FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 08/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 08/19/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 05/06/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 05/06/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 09/14/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 09/14/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 08/18/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 08/18/2016

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12115858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11939679.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF COURT TO DEDUCT COURT FILING FEES) FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 03/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1371198 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2017 02:20:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2534743 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/09/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • THE COURT TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C24.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4511534 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 11:12:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • ALVARADO, MARTHA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 03/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ALVARADO, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509734 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:36:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.