This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:20 (UTC).

MARK GRIPPI VS VICTORIA GRIPPI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MARK GRIPPI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VICTORIA GRIPPI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OSPINO, FRANK. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1715

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

OSPINO, FRANK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRIPPI, MARK T

Respondent

GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KRALL, WILLIAM E

Respondent Attorney

BLAGOF LAW FIRM, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/20/2018; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • LETTER - ATTORNEY 03/20/2018; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 03/20/2018; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/20/2018; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 03/20/2018; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 02/01/2018; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • HEARING - RFO - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • HEARING - RFO - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • NOTICE - OTHER 09/13/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, MARK T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 06/17/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/31/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 05/31/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GRIPPI, VICTORIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/22/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, MARK T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 04/22/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, MARK T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, MARK T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, MARK T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRIPPI, MARK T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GRIPPI, MARK T

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.