This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:33 (UTC).

MARK A. ROEHM VS. AANDREW S. KEIF

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MARK A ROEHM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AANDREW S KEIF. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK A. ROEHM

Defendant

ANDREW S. KEIF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM W. GREEN & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW W. MACRAE

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 05/11/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 05/11/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/12/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/12/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11947514 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11771657.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11947514 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11771657.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 04/06/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 04/06/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 05/25/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 05/25/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973195 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797355.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973195 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797355.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 05/11/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 05/11/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 06/21/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 06/21/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 05/25/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 05/25/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928263 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752481.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928263 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752481.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 04/06/2016

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 04/06/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2016 08:46:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2016 08:46:00 AM.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2016
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED ON 11/09/2016. 30-2016-00836456-CU-PA-CJC IS DESIGNATED THE LEAD CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/12/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 06/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1328774 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2016 03:56:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2016 08:46:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/12/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KEIF, ANDREW S. ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2453219 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016 04:42:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928263 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ROEHM, MARK A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385464 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:54:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.