This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:10 (UTC).

MARIZA RIOS VS JOSE HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by MARIZA RIOS against JOSE HERNANDEZ in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2496

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Others

HERNANDEZ, JOSE ISLAS

RIOS, MARIZA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 01/04/2018; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 01/04/2018 no movind document; copies only; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • STATEMENT / BRIEF 12/14/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 12/08/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • CERTIFICATE - SERVICE BY MAIL 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • ACCEPT - WILSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 10/31/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 10/31/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 10/31/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: RIOS, MARIZA

    Read MoreRead Less